CA SB1264 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12954 of the Government Code, relating to employment discrimination.
Title
Employment discrimination: cannabis use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12954 | Amended Code | Citation Text |