CA SB1272 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1749.5 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer protection.
Title
Gift certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3531.) (April 9). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1749.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |