CA SB1284 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1170 and 3550 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parole: medical parole: compassionate release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1284 Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3608.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3218.) (April 22). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |