CA SB1286 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1788.1, 1788.2, 1788.10, 1788.11, 1788.12, 1788.13, 1788.14, 1788.14.5, 1788.15, 1788.16, 1788.17, 1788.18, 1788.20, 1788.21, and 1788.22 of the Civil Code, relating to debt collection.
Title
Rosenthal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act: covered debt: commercial debts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.14.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |