CA SB1287 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66270.7 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: Equity in Higher Education Act: prohibition on harassment, intimidation, and discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66270.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |