CA SB1288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1279 and 1280.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health and care facilities.
Title
Health and care facilities: inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1288 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1288 Leyva Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1288 Leyva et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1288 Leyva Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1288 Leyva et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5961.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6715.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 19). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4340.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4240.) (May 22). |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4746.) (April 18). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |