CA SB1291 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 25257.5) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous chemicals.
Title
Chemicals of concern: flame retardants.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Leno (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Leno Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Leno Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Leno. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 13. Page 3795.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3795.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3674.) | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-10 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3300.) | |
2010-04-09 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |