CA SB1291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65074 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 182.6 and 182.7 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Statewide Transportation Improvement Program: submissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1291 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1291 TRANS. (Beall) Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-28AssemblyJuly 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3685.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65074Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code182.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code182.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback