CA SB1295 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.92 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification: Susanville Indian Rancheria.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19816 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1295 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1295 |