CA SB1304 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3131 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 13263.5 of the Water Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Underground injection control: aquifer exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3533.) (April 9). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9 in N.R. & W. pending receipt. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13263.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |