CA SB132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 2605 and 2606 to the Penal Code, relating to corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB132 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 132 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB132 Wiener (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 15.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-06-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-06-26AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2020-06-18AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Mark Stone.
2019-09-12AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2019-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1262.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2605New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2606New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback