CA SB1332 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12805.7 to the Government Code, relating to conservation.
Title
The Conservation Stewardship Endowment Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12805.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |