CA SB1337 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 104, 107, and 9020 of, and to repeal and add Section 9010 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: form of petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |