CA SB1341 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10823 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: Statewide Automated Welfare System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1341 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1341 Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1341 Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6167.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3344.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10823 | Amended Code | Citation Text |