CA SB1349 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14575 of the Public Resources Code, relating to beverage containers.
Title
Beverage containers: processing payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |