CA SB1367 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15053 of, to amend and repeal Section 15061 of, and to add and repeal Section 15061.1 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Agriculture: commercial feed: inspection tonnage tax: research and education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 15053 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 15061 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |