CA SB1381 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4502 and 17206.1 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1761 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 8769, 16191, 16195, 16196, 16200, 41306, 41401, and 51765 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 854.2, 6514, 12428, 12926, 14670.1, 14670.2, 14670.3, 14670.5, 14672.1, 14672.92, 16813, 16814, and 16816 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1275.5, 1337.1, 1337.3, 13113, 51312, 110403, 123935, 125000, 127260, and 129395 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 10118, 10124, and 10203.4 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 1001.20, 1346, 1370.1, 1376, and 2962 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 1420 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 25276 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 4417, 4426, 4512, 4801, 5002, 5008, 5325, 5585.25, 6250, 6505, 6513, 6551, 6715, 6717, 6740, 6741, 7275, 7351, and 11014 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 6500) of Chapter 2 of, to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 6715) of Chapter 3 of, and to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 6740) of Chapter 4 of, Part 2 of Division 6 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to intellectual disabilities.
Title
Mental retardation: change of term to intellectual
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1381 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BEALL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1381 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BEALL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1381 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BEALL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1381 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BEALL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1381 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1381 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5095.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6671.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6674.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-29 | In Assembly. Held at desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Page 6578.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-29 | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4679.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6011.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5898.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-06-28 | Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-06-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-06-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-05-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-23 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-04-12 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-04-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3129.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing March 28. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |