CA SB1384 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 21300) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to powered wheelchairs.
Title
Powered wheelchairs: repair.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3448.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3332.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21300 | New Code | See Bill Text |