CA SB1418 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65850.7 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Hydrogen-fueling stations: expedited review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3469.) (April 3). |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |