CA SB1422 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 52760) to Chapter 11 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teachers.
Title
Teachers: pupil survey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Assembly - SB 1422 Romero Senate Third Reading By COTO (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Romero (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Romero (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-25 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-08-13 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-10 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 6102.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 30.) | |
2010-05-28 | To Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 4. Page 3477.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3443.) | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 5. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-11 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |