CA SB1439 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing May 1.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing May 1.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54221 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Surplus Land Act: exempt surplus land: health facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |