CA SB1441 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 82015 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1441 Lara Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1441 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Lara (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1441 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Lara (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4951.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6539.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6020.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3438.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |