CA SB1442 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 82036, 82036.5, 82048.4, 84101, 84103, 84200, 84200.6, 84215, 84218, and 84252 of, to add Sections 84200.3 and 84620 to, to repeal Sections 84200.7, 84202.3, 84202.5, 84202.7, and 84203.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 84200.5 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign statements.
Sponsors
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1442 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB1442 Lara Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1442 Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB1442 Lara Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1442 Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 6755.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3613.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3717.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |