CA SB145 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 100235 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Robert F. Kennedy Farm Workers Medical Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 4)SB1 45 Pan Con (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 Pan (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 4)SB1 45 Pan Con (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 Pan (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2780.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 2787.) |
2015-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3181.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 9). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly rule 77.2. Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2690.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 26). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 817.) (April 28). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 100235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1262.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |