CA SB1466 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.19 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnosis, and Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1466 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1466 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1466 Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1466 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1466 Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6097.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14059.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |