CA SB1480 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 382.1 of, and to add Section 382.2 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Low-Income Oversight Board.
Title
Low-Income Oversight Board: membership and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 3445.) (April 2). |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 382.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 382.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |