CA SB1491 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 66262.7, 66271.2, 66271.3, 66290.2, and 66302 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: Equity in Higher Education Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3466.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | March 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66262.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66271.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66271.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66290.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |