CA SB1494 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53084.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Local agencies: Sales and Use Tax: retailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3664.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in REV. & TAX. pending receipt. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53084.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |