CA SB1499 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17501.8 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal Income Tax Law: deferred compensation: retirement account catch-up limits: contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17501.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |