CA SB17 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18754.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
California Sea Otter Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 17 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Monning (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Monning (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 743.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1702.) (April 20). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18754.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |