CA SB172 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9.9 (commencing with Section 1567.90) to Chapter 3 of, Article 2 (commencing with Section 1568.095) to Chapter 3.01 of, and Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 1569.280) to Chapter 3.2 of, Division 2 of, and to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 1568.01) to Chapter 3.01 of Division 2 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 17060, 25100, 25105, 25200, 26835, 29805, and 31700 of, and to add Sections 27881, 27882, and 27883 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 4684.53 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB172 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 172 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB172 Portantino et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 172 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB172 Portantino et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2888.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 3436.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 775.) (April 22). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 2). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1567.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.095 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 17060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27881 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27882 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27883 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4684.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |