CA SB183 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 66251, 66260.6, and 66270 of, and to add Section 66270.3 to, the Education Code, relating to educational equity.
Title
Educational equity: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB183 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 183 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 183 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA Amendment Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB183 Lara et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 183 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 183 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA Amendment Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB183 Lara et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5933.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6713.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 6544.) |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4006.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1209.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 43.54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66260.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66270.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2864 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7595.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5097.992 | New Code | See Bill Text |