CA SB199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 309.8 of, and to add Sections 309.9 and 911.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission: Office of the Safety Advocate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB199 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 199 Hill Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB199 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2830.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3192.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyJuly 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1092.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code309.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code309.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code911.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback