CA SB2 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 171b, 171d, 171.5, 171.7, 626.9, 25610, 25850, 26150, 26155, 26165, 26170, 26175, 26185, 26190, 26195, 26200, 26205, 26210, 26220, 26225, 29805, and 30370 of, to add Sections 25350, 26162, 26206, 26230, and 26235 to, and to repeal and add Section 26202 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB2 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 2 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-08 - Assembly - SB 2 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Portantino et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 2 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-08 - Assembly - SB 2 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Portantino et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2614.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3208.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3120.) |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 577.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |