CA SB206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 67456 to, and to add and repeal Section 67457 of, the Education Code, relating to collegiate athletics.
Title
Collegiate athletics: student athlete compensation and representation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB206 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 206 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB206 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 206 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB206 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2823.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3198.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1222.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1092.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | March 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67456 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 67457 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |