CA SB216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 44298 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Carl Moyer Memorial Air Quality Standards Attainment Program: used heavy-duty truck exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Result (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB216 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Result (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB216 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 804.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and TRANS. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44298 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |