CA SB217 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10166.05 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 22109.1 and 50141 of, and to add Section 22065 to, the Financial Code, relating to mortgage loan originators.
Title
Mortgage loan originators: licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Vargas [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB217 Vargas Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 217 Vargas Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 217 Vargas Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB217 Vargas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 217 Vargas Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 217 Vargas Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB217 Vargas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2382.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2433.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3007.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2772.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2582.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-13 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 579.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-24 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |
2011-02-10 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10166.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22065 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 50141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |