CA SB232 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 340 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment benefits.
Title
Employment Development Department: policies and practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB232 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB232 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 918.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 340 | New Code | See Bill Text |