CA SB233 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5653.2 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vacuum or suction dredge equipment: permits: refund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-07 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-01-04 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-12-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2009-02-24 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |