CA SB233 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 2076.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Practice of medicine: Arizona physicians: abortions and abortion-related care for Arizona patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - SB 233 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry Amendment Set #1 (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Weber. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 12). |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1161.) (May 18). |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3. Page 903.) (April 25). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 768.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2076.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |