CA SB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7502.1, 7522, 7582.2, 7742, 10131.3, 10166.07, 10177, 10232.4, 10239, 11000.1, 11243, 17537.2, and 20009 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1770, 1916.5, 2924, and 2953 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 336a and 580e of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 9201 of the Commercial Code, to amend Sections 191, 500, 1001, 1300, 1502.1, 2011, 2117.1, 7813.5, 8011.5, 8723, 12504, 12532, 12662, 13205, 13406, 13408.5, 14312, 15911.21, 17707.07, 17711.02, 25004, 25014.6, 25023, 25100, 25102, 25102.1, 25118, 25217, 25300, 25606, 25612.3, 28505, 28715, and 31115 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 818, 4970, 4995, 7273, 17303, 18027, 18339, and 18596 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 1322, 6276.18, 7603, 12657, 12659, and 75030.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 760, 771, 828, 845, 845.5, 1192, and 1758.993 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 186.9 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 10200 and 11604.5 of the Probate Code, and to amend Section 4734 of the Public Resources Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB251 B. & F.I (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 251 B. & F.I. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB251 B. & F.I. (Bradford) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 251 B. & F.I. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB251 B. & F.I. (Bradford) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2055.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2492.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | June 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10). |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |