CA SB256 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5915.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parklands.
Title
Parklands: City of Davis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent SB256 Dodd et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Assembly - SB 256 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB256 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Assembly - SB 256 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB256 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11). |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5915.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |