CA SB280 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12470.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employees.
Title
Public employees: compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12470.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |