CA SB292 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21168.6.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: administrative and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB292 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 292 Padilla Senate Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-14 | (Enrolled measure version corrected.) | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2382.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2433.) | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected September 9). Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 2982.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-06 | Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 6). | |
2011-09-02 | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2806.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 2862.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-06-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1140.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 850.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |