CA SB292 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12940 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Assembly - SB 292 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Corbett (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Corbett (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2292.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 607.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |