CA SB310 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 27 (commencing with Section 16100) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Water quality: stormwater and other runoff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB310 Ducheny (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Assembly - SB 310 Ducheny Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Ducheny (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Assembly - SB 310 Ducheny Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Ducheny (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2269.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-04 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-08-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-06-22 | To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W. | |
2009-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1142.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 1025.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.) | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |