CA SB318 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89036.5 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: personal services contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB318 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 318 Portantino Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB318 Portantino et al (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 318 Portantino Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB318 Portantino et al (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2886.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1391.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1182.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 620.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89036.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |