CA SB32 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 38567 and 38572 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 7360, 7362, 7363, and 7364 of, and to add Section 7374 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to transportation fuels, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Motor vehicle fuel tax: greenhouse gas reduction programs: suspension.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Sen. Roger Niello [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-19-2023]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 793.) Reconsideration granted. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38572 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7362 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7374 | New Code | See Bill Text |