CA SB325 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66602 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Trustees of the California State University: student members.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB325 Block Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - SB 325 Block Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB325 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - SB 325 Block Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB325 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1854.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2510.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2480.) |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 579.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 405.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |