CA SB325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22251, 22337, 22365, 22370, 22371, 22372, 22373, 22374, 22375, 22376, 22377, and 22380 of the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.
Title
Pilot Program for Increased Access to Responsible Small Dollar Loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB325 Mendoza Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and INS. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and GOV. & F. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22373 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22374 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22375 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22376 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12939.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |